RI S0069 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides local education agencies (LEAs) hiring site-based specialists for reading and math to receive state reimbursement based on enrollment and specific guidelines.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0069.pdf |