RI S0067 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of "individualized program plan" to require that evaluations issued thereby be conducted by an independent third party.
Title
Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0067.pdf |