RI S0044 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Elections -- Conduct Of Elections (would Delete The Option Of Straight Party Voting By Means Of A Single Mark In Non-primary Elections.)
Title
An Act Relating To Elections -- Conduct Of Elections (would Delete The Option Of Straight Party Voting By Means Of A Single Mark In Non-primary Elections.)
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2013) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0044.pdf |