RI S0037 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes and provide for online sports wagering through authorized hosting facilities in Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video-lottery Games, Table Games And Sports Wagering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSigned by Governor
2019-03-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-03-12HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-03-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/12/2019)
2019-03-05HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for consideration (03/05/2019)
2019-02-14HouseReferred to House Finance
2019-02-13SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (02/13/2019)
2019-02-06SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-02-06SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2019-02-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2019)
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback