RI S0037 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
In Amendment Of To Incorporate The Hopkins Hill Road Fire District
Title
In Amendment Of To Incorporate The Hopkins Hill Road Fire District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-29 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/29/2015) |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-04-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2015) |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/25/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2015) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |