RI S0032 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense -- National Guard: would eliminate the mandate that commissioned officers in the judge advocate general's department be a member of the Rhode Island bar, provided there is compliance with the Rhode Island Supreme Court Rules
Title
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense -- National Guard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-15 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2011-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | House passed Sub A | |
2011-06-01 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-01 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to House Veterans Affairs | |
2011-04-28 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-17 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-17 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0032.pdf |