RI S0023 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends car tax statutes so that the assessment of used motor vehicles would be based on the average trade-in price, rather than retail price. It would also extend the appeal period to forty-five (45) days.
Title
Excise On Motor Vehicles And Trailers
Sponsors
Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2015) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0023.pdf |