RI S0003 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the definitions of "collegiate sports or athletic event" and "sporting event" within the chapter on "video lottery games, table games and sports wagering".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Games, Table Games And Sports Wagering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseReferred to House Finance
2023-03-28SenateSenate read and passed
2023-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (03/28/2023)
2023-03-22SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-03-17SenateScheduled for consideration (03/22/2023)
2023-03-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2023)
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback