RI H8353 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Gender Inclusive Restroom Act to have a municipality apply to the state building code standard committee for a waiver in the case of undue burden with compliance.
Title
State Building Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |