RI H8351 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Warwick city council, by ordinance, to increase the veterans’ tax exemption to four thousand dollars ($4,000).
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |