RI H8349 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Moves the annual meeting of the district from June to July, and conform the notice requirements to those prescribed by statute, requiring posting on the secretary of state's website.
Title
In Amendment Of Chapter 974 Of The Public Laws, 1940, Entitled "to Incorporate The Stone Bridge Fire District And To Furnish A Supply Of Water For The Town Of Tiverton," As Amended
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |