RI H8342 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Have each public institution of postsecondary education establish a plan for addressing the mental health needs of its students. Each institution shall develop policies aimed at identifying a student exhibiting suicidal behavior or tendencies.
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |