RI H8330 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Christopher Buonanno to join Teeana Pauline Pimental and Brandon Matthew Caton in marriage on or about October 6, 2018, within the Town of North Kingstown, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | House read and passed |