RI H8327 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encourages school districts to train their school counselors on collaborating with business, industry and other community organizations to help create internships and apprenticeships.
Title
Relating To Education-student Performance
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |