RI H8275 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the DCYF and the department of education to identify or develop a program of age appropriate sexual abuse and sexual awareness education.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2018) |
2018-06-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8275.pdf |