RI H8267 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating To Term Lengths For Elected Officials In The City Of Warwick
Title
Relating To Term Lengths For Elected Officials In The City Of Warwick
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |