RI H8258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the composition of the Advisory Council on Alzheimers Disease Research and Treatment" to include 6 additional members and renames the council the "Advisory Council on Alzheimers Disease and Related Disorders."
Title
Rhode Island Program To Address Alzheimer's Disease
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2022) |
2022-06-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2022) |
2022-05-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |