RI H8252 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enables all persons with at least two (2) years law enforcement or military work experience to work as a school security employee regardless of the nature, source or amount of their other income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Security Personnel Employment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-05-30HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback