RI H8224 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting Date Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Potential Economic Opportunities In The Development Of Port Facilities In The State Of Rhode Island
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting Date Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Potential Economic Opportunities In The Development Of Port Facilities In The State Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | House read and passed | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-03 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H8224.pdf |