RI H8219 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the prioritizing of state aid for the funding of full-day kindergarten programs. The commissioner of elementary and secondary education would rank all eligible school districts to ensure the quality and sustainability of each program.
Title
Average Daily Membership - School Population
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |