RI H8215 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Coventry to issue up to twenty million dollars in bonds and notes to finance rehabilitation of town buildings.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Coventry To Finance The Rehabilitation Of The Existing Human Services Building Including Construction Of An Addition Thereto For Reuse As A Police Station/human Services Complex And All Costs Incidental Or Related Thereto Including Construction, Furnishing And Equipping Thereof, By The Issuance Of Not More Than $12,000,000 Bonds And/or Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |