RI H8214 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Coderre Drywall, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Coderre Drywall, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-20HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-20SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-20SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-14HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/14/2018)
2018-06-05HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-05-23HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback