RI H8212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends teacher certifications without fee or penalty for three (3) years for teachers who hold certifications as of July 1, 2022.
Title
Certification Of Teachers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-05-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8212.pdf |