RI H8212 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the department of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals with the power and duty to certify a list of chemical dependency professionals for use by state agencies and for referral of individuals for treatment.
Title
Powers And Duties -- Chemical Dependency Professionals
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Kenneth Mendonca [R] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-05-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |