RI H8209 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- MOTOR VEHICLE OFFENSES - Requires persons convicted of driving under influence or refusal to submit to chemical test, have an ignition interlock system installed in vehicle as part of sentence and to pay an assessment to pay for the systems for indigent defendants.
Title
Requires persons convicted of driving under influence or refusal to submit to chemical test, have an ignition interlock system installed in vehicle as part of sentence and to pay an assessment to pay for the systems for indigent defendants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2024) |
2024-04-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8209.pdf |