RI H8207 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a formal statement of foster parents' bill of rights, and requires that copies be given to all foster parents upon licensing and at each licensing interval.
Title
Foster Parents' Bill Of Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Jan Malik [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-05-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |