RI H8181 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 To The City Of Warwick As Compensation For Municipal Services Provided At Rhode Island T.f. Green International Airport (this Joint Resolution Would Provide Payment Of $500,000 To The City Of Warwick For Municipal Services Provided To Rhode Island T.f. Green International Airport.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING AN APPROPRIATION OF $500,000 TO THE CITY OF WARWICK AS COMPENSATION FOR MUNICIPAL SERVICES PROVIDED AT RHODE ISLAND T.F. GREEN INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT (This joint resolution would provide payment of $500,000 to the City of Warwick for municipal services provided to Rhode Island T.F. Green International Airport.)
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-04-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8181.pdf |