RI H8180 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Rhode Island Clean Water Finance Agency (act Would Expand The Definition Of "financial Assistance" Involving The Funding Of Water And Sewer Projects To Meet Federal Requirements)
Title
An Act Relating To Waters And Navigation -- Rhode Island Clean Water Finance Agency (act Would Expand The Definition Of "financial Assistance" Involving The Funding Of Water And Sewer Projects To Meet Federal Requirements)
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | House read and passed | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-01 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-26 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H8180.pdf |