RI H8177 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Rhode Island (would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The "special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Rhode Island" To December 31, 2012 And February 28, 2013, Respectively.)
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Rhode Island (would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The "special Legislative Commission To Study The Public Funded Election System In The State Of Rhode Island" To December 31, 2012 And February 28, 2013, Respectively.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2012-05-30 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/31/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | House read and passed | |
2012-05-22 | Placed on House Calendar (05/24/2012) | |
2012-05-22 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2012) | |
2012-05-17 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8177.pdf |