RI H8173 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the annual financial town meeting date for Town of Scituate to the first Tuesday in the month of June starting in the calendar year 2024.
Title
In Amendment Of Section 4 Of Chapter 1321 Of The Public Laws, 1915, Entitled "fixing The Time For The Election Of Officers In The Town Of Scituate" As Previously Amended By Chapter 3777 Of The Public Laws Of 1956 And Authorizing The Town Of Scituate To Change The Date Of Its Fiscal Year And Allowing The Tax Levy For A Transitional Fiscal Year To Exceed The Maximum Set Forth In Section 44-5-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-06-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2022) |
2022-04-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |