RI H8169 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The Port Of Galilee Task Force (would Extend The Reporting Date Of The Special House Commission Known As The Port Of Galilee Task Force From May 1, 2012, To December 1, 2012, And Said Commission Would Expire On December 31, 2012.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The Port Of Galilee Task Force (would Extend The Reporting Date Of The Special House Commission Known As The Port Of Galilee Task Force From May 1, 2012, To December 1, 2012, And Said Commission Would Expire On December 31, 2012.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | House read and passed | |
2012-05-24 | Placed on House Calendar (05/31/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-05-22 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H8169.pdf |