RI H8146 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expirations Dates And Amending The Purpose Of The Special Legislative Commission To Review And Provide Recommendations For Policies That Deal With Numerous Economic And Social Short-term Rentals Issues (this Resolution Would Amend And Expand The Purpose Of Said Legislative Commission, And Extend The Reporting And Expirations Dates From March 15, 2024, To September 30, 2025, And Said Commission Would Expire On December 10, 2025.)
Title
HOUSE RESOLUTION EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATIONS DATES AND AMENDING THE PURPOSE OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO REVIEW AND PROVIDE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR POLICIES THAT DEAL WITH NUMEROUS ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL SHORT-TERM RENTALS ISSUES (This resolution would amend and expand the purpose of said legislative commission, and extend the reporting and expirations dates from March 15, 2024, to September 30, 2025, and said commission would expire on December 10, 2025.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-04-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8146.pdf |