RI H8135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $1,000,000 To The University Of Rhode Island (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $1,000,000 To The University Of Rhode Island To Expand The State's Economic Opportunities In Regenerative Agriculture Technologies.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $1,000,000 To The University Of Rhode Island (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $1,000,000 To The University Of Rhode Island To Expand The State's Economic Opportunities In Regenerative Agriculture Technologies.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2022-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-04-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H8135.pdf |