RI H8132 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-10 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires teachers and coaches of a child as a volunteer or for compensation to comply with criminal records review process.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] |
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2022-05-25 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2022) |
2022-05-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-17 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2022) |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-04-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |