RI H8122 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifies the process of doing business in Rhode Island by eliminating unnecessary licensing requirements of various business entities.
Title
Relating To Licenses Generally
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2018-06-13 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-06-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2018) |
2018-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2018) |
2018-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |