RI H8119 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- LOW-SPEED VEHICLES - Provides that low-speed vehicles may be operated on limited access highways, state highways, through highways and public highways or roadways provided the speed limit on the highways and roadways is no more than thirty-five miles per hour (35 m.p.h.).
Title
Provides that low-speed vehicles may be operated on limited access highways, state highways, through highways and public highways or roadways provided the speed limit on the highways and roadways is no more than thirty-five miles per hour (35 m.p.h.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2024-06-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2024) |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-05-22 | House | House read and passed |
2024-05-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2024) |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2024) |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |