RI H8119 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of stunguns/tasers after issuance of permit from attorney general.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8119.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8119A.pdf |