RI H8118 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes City of Providence to issue $140,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance, improvements to school buildings and facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The City Of Providence To Issue Not To Exceed $140,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Landscaping, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The City, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 75% At The Time Of Issuance And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By The Amount Of Certain Grants Received From State Bond Proceeds, From The Rhode Island Department Of Education Or From The Rhode Island School Building Authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-29HouseCommittee recommends passage
2020-07-27HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/29/2020)
2020-07-23HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback