RI H8103 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Jonathan Silva to join Angela Elena Silva and John McVey Tully in marriage on or about September 18, 2020, within the Town of Westerly, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-25 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House read and passed |