RI H8094 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This act makes a number of technical amendments to the general laws, prepared at the recommendation of the Law Revision Office.
Title
Relating To Statutory Construction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-25 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House read and passed |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/07/2020) |
2020-07-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |