RI H8090 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Pawtucket to issue $32M general obligation bonds, notes and other indebtedness to finance the construction, renovation, improvement, alteration, repair, furnishing and equipping of schools and school facilities in Pawtucket.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Pawtucket To Issue Not To Exceed $32,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The City
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-11 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-05 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-05-29 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2014) |
2014-05-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |