RI H8083 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the suppression of summary of benefits forms or certain information contained therein when the information would expose the insured to danger for seeking medical care.
Title
Unfair Competition And Claims Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8083.pdf |