RI H8081 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Cranston to issue not more than $2,000,000 general obligation bonds and temporary notes for the acquisition, construction, improvement, renovation, repair, alteration and equipping of playgrounds and athletic fields in the city.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Cranston To Finance The Acquisition, Construction, Improvement, Renovation, Repair, Alteration And Equipping Of Playgrounds And Athletic Fields In The City By The Issuance Of Not More Than $2,000,000 General Obligation Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-05-29 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/29/2014) |
2014-05-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2014) |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |