RI H8079 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Judy Kaye to join Randee Weitzman and Abdelkader Belaid in marriage on or about September 8, 2018, within the Town of Westerly, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-05-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/30/2018) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-05-10 | House | House read and passed |
2018-05-04 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/10/2018) |
2018-05-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018) |
2018-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |