RI H8077 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish, And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (change The Name Of The State)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish, And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (change The Name Of The State)
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House read and passed |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/07/2020) |
2020-06-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |