RI H8076 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION -- LIFE ESTATE - Entitles holders of a life estate to real property to use any veteran's tax exemptions available to them.
Title
Entitles holders of a life estate to real property to use any veteran's tax exemptions available to them.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2024) |
2024-06-10 | House | House read and passed |
2024-06-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2024) |
2024-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2024) |
2024-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Taxation
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION -- LIFE ESTATE
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION -- LIFE ESTATE