RI H8058 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a procedure to consider a reduction of the premium tax rate for qualifying insurers that have added new, full-time qualifying jobs in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation Of Insurance Companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-07HouseSigned by Governor
2016-09-01HouseTransmitted to Governor
2016-06-18SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2016-06-18SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016)
2016-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub A
2016-06-17HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2016)
2016-06-17HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2016-06-17HouseScheduled for consideration (06/17/2016)
2016-05-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2016-05-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2016)
2016-04-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback