RI H8048 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-18 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-18 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Towing Storage Act's Provisions Relative To Police Seizures Of Vehicles (creates A 7 Member Commission To Study And Make Recommendations On The Towing Storage Act's Provisions Relative To Police Seizures Of Vehicles, And Who Would Report To The House By January 4, 2017, And Would Expire On March 4, 2017.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Towing Storage Act's Provisions Relative To Police Seizures Of Vehicles (creates A 7 Member Commission To Study And Make Recommendations On The Towing Storage Act's Provisions Relative To Police Seizures Of Vehicles, And Who Would Report To The House By January 4, 2017, And Would Expire On March 4, 2017.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House voted to recommit to House Judiciary |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-04-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |