RI H8029 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 House Finance Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 House Finance Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enabling act required by § 16-7-44 in order for the principal of, and interest on bonds issued by the Town of Burrillville in support of school housing projects to be eligible for state housing aid reimbursement.
Title
IN ACCORDANCE WITH RHODE ISLAND GENERAL LAWS § 16-7-44, APPROVING THE ISSUANCE OF $6,400,000 BONDS BY THE TOWN OF BURRILLVILLE TO FINANCE THE CONSTRUCTION, RENOVATION, IMPROVEMENT, ALTERATION, REPAIR, LANDSCAPING, FURNISHING AND EQUIPPING OF SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL FACILITIES THROUGHOUT THE TOWN, AND ALL ATTENDANT EXPENSES INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, ENGINEERING AND ARCHITECTURAL COSTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8029.pdf |