RI H8025 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Gary LeFave to join Gabrielle Marie Paci and Paul Daniel Gelinas in marriage on or about June 26, 2014, within the Town of Narragansett, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/08/2014) |
2014-05-06 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-05-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2014) |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-04-29 | House | House read and passed |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (04/29/2014) |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-04-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |